EP2120005 - Interferometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/46] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Otha-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Shigeki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/46] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
Kato, Shigeki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
Kato, Shigeti c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006410.6 | 12.05.2009 | [2009/47] | Priority number, date | JP20080125655 | 13.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008125655 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120005 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2120005 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, G01B11/14 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
G01B9/02018 (EP,US);
G01B9/02 (KR);
G01B11/14 (EP,US);
G01B9/02059 (EP,US);
G02B13/00 (KR);
G02B5/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | Interferometer | [2009/47] | English: | Interferometer | [2009/47] | French: | Interféromètre | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2009 | AT | 14.11.2012 | BE | 14.11.2012 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | HR | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | MK | 14.11.2012 | MT | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | NO | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | ES | 25.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | IE | 12.05.2013 | LU | 12.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 12.05.2009 | |
AT | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
LU | 12.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
NO | 14.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003007156 (DE GROOT PETER J [US], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2005110971 (MARIA BEEMS MARCEL H [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2007223005 (LEE WILLIAM E [GB]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US2005110971 | US2007223005 |