EP2119861 - Door stopper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huber, Johann Gewerbetrasse 2 84546 Egglkofen / DE | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Rothkopf, Ferdinand Rothkopf Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 25 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Rothkopf, Ferdinand Rothkopf Theobald Elbel Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006466.8 | 13.05.2009 | [2009/47] | Priority number, date | DE20082006503U | 13.05.2008 Original published format: DE 202008006503 U | [2009/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2119861 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2119861 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E05F5/06, E05F5/02 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
E05F5/06 (EP);
E05Y2201/224 (EP);
E05Y2600/46 (EP);
E05Y2600/626 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Türanschlagschutz | [2009/47] | English: | Door stopper | [2009/47] | French: | Protection de butée de porte | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/50] | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005229358 (BARONE NEIL [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-3 * [I] 4,6,7; | [XI]US2419449 (HILTON WILLIAM) [X] 1-5,8 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 18; figures 1-4 * [I] 6; | [A]US2007163077 (YANG JUN-JIE [TW] ET AL) [A] 6,7 * paragraph [0024]; figure 3 * |