EP2083004 - Electron donors, electron acceptors and adhesion promoters containing disulfide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Musa, Osama, M. 24 Meadowbrook Drive Hillsborough NJ 08844 / US | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006543.4 | 03.03.2003 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | US20020113059 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: US 113059 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2083004 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2083004 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/12, C07F7/18, C09J121/00 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
C07C323/12 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2009/31] | Title | German: | Elektronendonatoren, Elektronenakzeptoren und Adhäsionsförderer mit einem Disulfid | [2009/31] | English: | Electron donors, electron acceptors and adhesion promoters containing disulfide | [2009/31] | French: | Donneurs d'électron, accepteurs d'électron et promoteurs d'adhésion contenant du disulfure | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 09.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 19.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03746036.7 / EP1490331 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030746036) is 24.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP2000103940 [ ] (TOSHIBA CHEM CORP); | [A]US3655633 (SAAM JOHN C) [A] 1,2,5,6 * examples 1-3 *; | [A]US3278484 (TESORO GIULIANA C) [A] 1,2 * column 1, lines 10-40; column 4, formula (14); example 4 *; | [A]US4072701 (PLETKA HANS-DIETER, et al) [A] 1,2,5 * column 1, lines 11-37; column 3, lines 4-8; column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 12; table 1, entries 2, 5, 8, 11, 14, 17 *; | [A]EP1156053 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2000), Database accession no. 2000:236142, XP002260341 [A] 1,2,5,6 * abstract; RN 56706-10-6 * | by applicant | US6307001 | US6300456 | US6057381 | US6063828 | US6180187 | US6187886 | US6281314 | US6265530 | US3653959 | US4422914 | US4442198 | US4443495 | US4451636 | US4481281 |