EP2127905 - Pneumatic tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagayoshi, Masatoshi@c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1 Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
Nagayoshi, Masatoshi c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1 Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | ||
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
Nagayoshi, Masatoshi c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1 Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006629.1 | 15.05.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | JP20080135627 | 23.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008135627 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2127905 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2127905 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2127905 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/00 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
B60C11/1369 (EP);
B60C11/0306 (EP);
B60C11/1263 (EP);
B60C2011/0348 (EP);
B60C2011/0353 (EP);
B60C2011/0355 (EP);
B60C2200/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | Luftreifen | [2009/49] | English: | Pneumatic tire | [2009/49] | French: | Pneu | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 21.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2009 | AT | 18.01.2012 | BE | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | HR | 18.01.2012 | IT | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | LV | 18.01.2012 | MK | 18.01.2012 | MT | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | TR | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | NO | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | ES | 29.04.2012 | IE | 15.05.2012 | LU | 15.05.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
LU | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH11348510 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1,6,7 * figures 1,3 * [Y] 2,3,5; | [Y]JP2001219712 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 2,3,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2002046422 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 4* figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US6578612 (MATSUMURA TOMOYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,6,7 * figures 1-4,6,12 * [Y] 2,3,5; | [Y]US2006016538 (MIYAZAKI TETSUJI [JP]) [Y] 2,3,5 * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | JPH11348510 | JP2007302071 |