EP2130838 - Zinc finger binding domains for CNN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Scripps Research Institute 10550 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbas, Carols F., III 624 Granados Avenue Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | 02 /
Dreier, Birgit Loowiesenstrasse 15 8106 Regensdorf 2 Adlikon ZH / CH | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09 40031 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006667.1 | 26.07.2006 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | US20050707839P | 11.08.2005 Original published format: US 707839 P | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2130838 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2130838 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/5308 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | Zinkfinger-Bindungsdomänen für CNN | [2009/50] | English: | Zinc finger binding domains for CNN | [2009/50] | French: | Domaines de liaison de doigts de zinc pour CNN | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 24.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06836095.7 / EP1928897 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03016496 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-15,18-40 * the whole document * | by applicant | - R. R. BEERLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, page 14628 | - X. LIU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, page 10669 |