EP2123907 - Signal device for offshore wind park [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senvion GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Senvion SE Überseering 10 (Oval Office) 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states REpower Systems SE Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states REpower Systems AG Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carstensen, Lorenz-Heinrich Norderfeld 3a 25855 Haselund / DE | 02 /
Altemark, Jens Kronwerker Moor 33 24768 Rendsburg / DE | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/13] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006677.0 | 18.05.2009 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | DE20081024380 | 20.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008024380 | [2009/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2123907 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2123907 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2123907 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D9/00 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
F03D80/10 (EP,US);
F03D80/00 (EP,US);
F05B2240/95 (EP);
F05B2240/96 (EP,US);
F05B2270/404 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
Y02E10/727 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | F03D9/00, F03D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Signaleinrichtung für Offshore-Windpark | [2009/48] | English: | Signal device for offshore wind park | [2009/48] | French: | Dispositif de signal pour éolienne offshore | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 26.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2009 | CY | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | ES | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | HR | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | MK | 29.03.2017 | MT | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | AT | 18.05.2017 | LU | 18.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | NO | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 18.05.2009 | |
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 18.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.05.2009 | |
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 18.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.05.2009 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 18.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 18.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
AT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 18.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10231299 (GEO GES FUER EN UND OEKOLOGIE [DE]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0019] *; | [A]WO2004012182 (TSX PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]WO2007093570 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |