EP2090373 - Apparatus for spraying liquids, and disposable containers and liners suitable for use therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/12] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states 3M COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joseph, Stephen C. P. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Douglas, Malcolm F. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Butler, Alan F. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
Bastow, David R. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
Salhus, Jerry E. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
Hartfel, Margaret E. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2014/25] |
Former [2009/34] | 01 /
Joseph, Stephen C. P. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
Douglas, Malcolm F. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
Butler, Alan F. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
Bastow, David R. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
05 /
Salhus, Jerry E. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
06 /
Hartfel, Margaret E. c/o 3M Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [2020/12] |
Former [2014/25] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/34] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 09006817.2 | 14.01.1998 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | GB19970001447 | 24.01.1997 Original published format: GB 9701447 | GB19970012784 | 18.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9712784 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2090373 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2090373 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2090373 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2090373 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/24, B05B15/06 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
B05B7/24 (EP,KR,US);
B05B7/2408 (EP);
B05B7/2478 (EP);
B05B7/2481 (EP);
B05B15/62 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2020/12] |
Former [2009/34] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Sprühen von Flüssigkeiten und Einwegbehälter und "Liner" dafür | [2009/35] | English: | Apparatus for spraying liquids, and disposable containers and liners suitable for use therewith | [2009/34] | French: | Appareil de pulvérisation de liquides et récipients et garnitures jetables utilisables avec celui-ci | [2009/35] |
Former [2009/34] | Vorrichtung zum Sprühen von Flüssigkeiten und Einwegbehälter und -Auskleidungen die dafür geeignet sind | ||
Former [2009/34] | Appareil de vaporisation de liquides, conteneurs jetables et doublures adaptés à son utilisation | Examination procedure | 02.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04002190.9 / EP1435265 | EP98901823.9 / EP0954381 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980901823) is 08.01.2002 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2015
02.07.2019
WITHDRAWN Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. One New Bond Street P.O.Box No 15008 Worcester MA, 01615 / US Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | 02
25.11.2015
02.07.2019
WITHDRAWN Saint-Gobain Abrasives GmbH Birkenstrasse 45-49 50389 Wesseling / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | 03
21.10.2016
02.07.2019
WITHDRAWN Saint-Gobain Abrasifs Rue de l'Ambassadeur 78700 Conflans-Sainte-Honorine / FR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | [2019/32] |
Former [2016/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2015
23.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. One New Bond Street P.O.Box No 15008 Worcester MA, 01615 / US Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
02
25.11.2015
24.02.2016
INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE Saint-Gobain Abrasives GmbH Birkenstrasse 45-49 50389 Wesseling / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | |||
03
21.10.2016
09.11.2016
INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE Saint-Gobain Abrasifs Rue de l'Ambassadeur 78700 Conflans-Sainte-Honorine / FR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2015
23.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. One New Bond Street P.O.Box No 15008 Worcester MA, 01615 / US Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
02
25.11.2015
24.02.2016
INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE Saint-Gobain Abrasives GmbH Birkenstrasse 45-49 50389 Wesseling / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2015
23.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. One New Bond Street P.O.Box No 15008 Worcester MA, 01615 / US Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
02
25.11.2015
25.11.2015
INTERVENTION Saint-Gobain Abrasives GmbH Birkenstrasse 45-49 50389 Wesseling / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2015
23.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. One New Bond Street P.O.Box No 15008 Worcester MA, 01615 / US Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
02
25.11.2015
WITHDRAWN Saint-Gobain Abrasives GmbH Birkenstrasse 45-49 50389 Wesseling / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.03.2015
WITHDRAWN Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. One New Bond Street P.O.Box No 15008 Worcester MA, 01615 / US Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | 07.12.2015 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 05.02.2016 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 02.03.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.07.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.08.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.01.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.01.2018 | Appeal received No. T2649/17 | 15.03.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.08.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 08.12.2017 | Appeal received No. T2649/17 | 14.03.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.08.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 13.01.2018 | ES | 15.01.2018 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/21] | GB | 13.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5248089 (BEKIUS WAYNE [US]) [X] 1,3,9 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 26; figures 1-6 * [A] 2,4-8; | [Y]US3432104 (KALTENBACH THEODORE L) [Y] 2-9 * column 1, line 25 - line 43 * * column 2, line 5 - line 9 * * column 3, line 14 - line 16 * * figures 1,3 *; | [Y]EP0678334 (RANSBURG CORP [US]) [Y] 2-9 * column 3, line 43 - line 46 * * figures 3,5 * | by applicant | US4383635 | US3211324 | US3255972 | US4151929 | US4951875 | US5143294 | EP0678334 | Opposition | GB2303087 | US5248089 | US3211324 | US3255972 | US4951875 | FR1282085 | US5094543 | DE2412743 | US3672645 | US4383635 | US4321922 | US5727878 |