Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2145532T | 30.06.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102008033919 | 18.07.2008 | EP09007031 | 27.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7908832 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2011 | B2 | US2010011736 | 21.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008033919 | 18.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2145532 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2016 | B1 | EP2145532 | 20.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008033919 | 18.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008033919 | 27.05.2010 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102008033919 | 18.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2565752T | 06.04.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102008033919 | 18.07.2008 |