EP2128483 - Motion-dependent dampening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüß / DE | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH Dr.-Hell-Strasse 24107 Kiel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckhoff, Detlev Fellhusen 24238 Selent / DE | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09007044.2 | 27.05.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | DE20081025482 | 27.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008025482 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128483 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128483 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/512 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
F16F9/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | Bewegungsabhängige Dämpfung | [2009/49] | English: | Motion-dependent dampening | [2009/49] | French: | Amortissement dépendant du mouvement | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.2012
24.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Krauss-Maffei Wegmann GmbH & Co. KG Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 11 80997 München / DE Opponent's representative Feder Walter Ebert, et al, et al Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Achenbachstrasse 59 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.2012
24.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Krauss-Maffei Wegmann GmbH & Co. KG Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 11 80997 München / DE Opponent's representative Feder Walter Ebert, et al, et al Patentanwälte Achenbachstrasse 59 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | 26.11.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.03.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.06.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.06.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.06.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.06.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.12.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/12] | 28.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 19.08.2014 | Appeal received No. T1730/14 | 30.10.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.12.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2009 | CH | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | HR | 18.01.2012 | IE | 18.01.2012 | IT | 18.01.2012 | LI | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | LV | 18.01.2012 | MK | 18.01.2012 | MT | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | TR | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | NO | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | ES | 29.04.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | LU | 27.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | AT | 27.05.2014 | [2018/21] |
Former [2015/38] | HU | 27.05.2009 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
LU | 27.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
AT | 27.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 27.05.2009 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
LU | 27.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
LU | 27.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 18.01.2012 | |
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 18.01.2012 | |
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 18.01.2012 | |
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 18.01.2012 | |
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1093145 (LANGEN & CO) [X] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | DE1093145 |