EP2093694 - Receiving chamber for a laser reader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datalogic S.p.A. Via Candini 2 40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno / IT | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oliva, Guido Maurizio corso del Popolo, 427 45100 Rovigo / IT | 02 /
Vonmetz, Kurt via Pietralata, 28 40122 Bologna / IT | 03 /
Amorosi, Stefano Via Valdossola, 24/2 40134 Bologna / IT | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Riccardi, Elisa, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Riccardi, Elisa, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09007131.7 | 28.12.2000 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | EP20000830707 | 26.10.2000 Original published format: EP 00830707 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093694 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2093694 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
G06K7/10633 (EP);
G06K7/10574 (EP);
G06K7/10603 (EP);
G02B6/4204 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H01L33/58 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | Aufnahmekammer für Laserlesevorrichtungen | [2009/35] | English: | Receiving chamber for a laser reader | [2009/35] | French: | Chambre de réception pour lecteur laser | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00830860.3 / EP1207489 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000830860) is 18.03.2003 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.06.2011 | BE | 22.06.2011 | CY | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | NL | 22.06.2011 | SE | 22.06.2011 | TR | 22.06.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | ES | 03.10.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | GB | 28.12.2011 | IE | 28.12.2011 | LU | 28.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LU | 28.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29616565U (HUONKER MARTIN DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US5763866 (SEO SHUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 8-41; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0652530 | - B.ROGGE ET AL., "Magnetic Microactuators Fabricated by the LIGA-Technique for Large Displacements or Large Forces", PROC. ACTUATOR '96, BREMEN, pages 112 - 115 | - CHONG H.AHN; MARK G.ALLEN, "A fully integrated Surface Micromachined Magnetic Microactuator with a Multilevel Meander Magnetic Core", JOURNAL OF MEMS, (1993), vol. 2, pages 15 - 22 | - B.SCHMIDT; J.FLUITMAN, UETP MEMS -CA PROJECT- COURSE MICRO ACTUATORS, (1997), pages 3 - 1 | - W.S.N. TRIMMER; K.J.GABRIEL, "Design considerations for a practical electrostatic micromotor", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, (1987), vol. 11, pages 189 - 206 | - S. BART ET AL., "Electric micromotors dymamics", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, (1992), vol. 39, pages 566 - 575 |