EP2151692 - Compensation electricity converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REO Inductive Components AG Brühler Strasse 100 42657 Solingen / DE | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Resch, Otto Apianring 1 84371 Triftern / DE | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB ALPHA-Haus Garmischer Strasse 35 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Karakatsanis Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09007173.9 | 29.05.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | DE20081036582 | 06.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008036582 | [2010/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2151692 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2151692 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/20 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G01R15/202 (EP);
G01R15/207 (EP);
G01R19/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kompensationsstromwandler | [2010/06] | English: | Compensation electricity converter | [2010/06] | French: | Convertisseur de courant de compensation | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/16] | 27.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4202296 (ASAHI KASEI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 3 - line 14; figures , 9, 11 * * page 5, line 53 - line 54 * * abstract *; | [A]US4682101 (CATTANEO PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]JPS58216412 (SANEISHA SEISAKUSHO KK, et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]JP2007057294 (HIOKI ELECTRIC WORKS) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US6459349 (GIDAY ZOLTAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | by applicant | DE69714871T |