Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2138362 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2011 | B1 | EP2138362 | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008030220 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE495063T | 15.01.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008030220 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008030220 | 31.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008030220 | 25.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502009000281D1 | 24.02.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008030220 | 25.06.2008 |