EP2261618 - Miniature infrared light source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axetris AG Schwarzenbergstrasse 10 6056 Kägiswil / CH | [2012/08] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Leister Process Technologies Galileo-Strasse 10 6056 Kägiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubochet, Oliver Schlierenhölzlistrasse 48 6056 Kägiswil / CH | 02 /
Krebs, Stefan Robert-Barmettlerstrasse 2 6055 Alpnach / CH | 03 /
Hessler, Thomas Hubel 10 6072 Sachseln / CH | [2011/11] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Dubochet, oliver Schlierenhölzlistrasse 48 6056 Kägiswil / CH | ||
02 /
Krebs, Stefan Robert-Barmettlerstrasse 2 6055 Alpnach / CH | |||
03 /
Hessler, Thomas Hubel 10 6072 Sachseln / CH | Representative(s) | Klocke, Peter ABACUS Patentanwälte Lise-Meitner-Strasse 21 72202 Nagold / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Klocke, Peter ABACUS Patentanwälte Klocke Späth Barth Zürichstrasse 34 8134 Adliswil/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 09007538.3 | 08.06.2009 | [2010/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2261618 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/10, H05B3/26 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
G01J3/108 (EP);
G01J3/0291 (EP);
G01J3/42 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2924/10253 (EP);
H01L33/486 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Miniatur-Infrarotlichtquelle | [2010/50] | English: | Miniature infrared light source | [2010/50] | French: | Source infrarouge miniature | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000236110 (ANRITSU CORP) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0085]; figures 4,5,9,10 *; | [Y]EP0400175 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE2442892 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [Y] 1-11 * page 4 - page 7; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE10200908 (WIEGLEB GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 9-11 * the whole document * |