EP2159659 - Autonomous moving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3, Minami Ochiai-cho Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriguchi, Toshiki Murata Machinery Ltd. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | 02 /
Murayama, Takahiko Murata Machinery Ltd. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | 03 /
Okada, Takuya Murata Machinery Ltd. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2010/09] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09007790.0 | 12.06.2009 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | JP20080214636 | 22.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008214636 | JP20080296286 | 20.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008296286 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2159659 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2159659 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B60B19/00 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G05D1/0227 (EP,US);
B25J5/00 (KR);
B25J13/08 (KR);
B60B19/003 (EP,US);
G05D1/024 (EP,US);
G05D1/0274 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/09] | G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Autonomer Antrieb | [2010/09] | English: | Autonomous moving apparatus | [2010/09] | French: | Appareil de déplacement autonome | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2701429 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) [A] 5* page 16, line 23 - page 17, line 19; figures 3,5 *; | [X]WO0239868 (DUPLEX CLEANING MACHINES PTY L [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,6-14 * pages 5-7; figures 1-6 *; | [X]NL1022340C (CRAMER ANDREAS EVERT [NL]) [X] 1-14 * page 2, lines 21-26; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1582957 (ROYAL APPLIANCE MFG [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0044] , [0047] , [0055] - [0057] - [0108] - [0113]; figures 3,4,19,20,24,25 *; | [A]WO2007035122 (UNIV DO MINHO [PT]) [A] 5 * figures 2,4b *; | [X]DE102006008415 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0021] - [0036]; figures 1,2,7 *; | [A]US2007150111 (WU LI-WEI [TW], et al) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0037] , [0044] - [0048]; figures 2,6-10 *; | [A]US2007150096 (YEH SYH-SHIUH [TW], et al) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0028] , [0031]; figures 1,2,5 * |