EP2151802 - Image processor and image processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terada, Munehiro c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Nagai, Kenichi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09007864.3 | 16.06.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | JP20080201201 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008201201 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151802 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G06T3/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildprozessor und Bildverarbeitungsverfahren | [2010/06] | English: | Image processor and image processing method | [2010/06] | French: | Processeur d'images et procédé de traitement d'images | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 24.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Divisional application(s) | EP11157292.1 / EP2355038 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9016034 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 10, paragraph 1 * * figure 4 *; | [I]US5774601 (MAHMOODI ABOLGHASSEM B [US]) [I] 1-11 * page 27; figure 1 * * figure 3 * * page 4, lines 2-5 * * page 27 *; | [I]WO2005041170 (NOKIA CORPRATION [FI], et al) [I] 1 * page 12, lines 13-16 * * figure 4 *; | [I]WO0159706 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 7 * figure 5 *; | [A]US7405740 (NEUGEBAUER CHARLES F [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9016035 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6801339 (ITO WATARU [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2007310837 | JP2008098803 | JP2000188680 | JP2008035404 |