EP2135976 - Crucible holding member and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibiden Co., Ltd. 1, Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8604 / JP | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Hideki c/o Aoyanagi Plant IBIDEN CO., LTD. 300 Aoyanagi-cho Ogaki Gifu / JP | 02 /
Shikano, Haruhide c/o Aoyanagi Plant IBIDEN CO., LTD. 300 Aoyanagi-cho Ogaki Gifu / JP | 03 /
Yasuda, Masahiro c/o Aoyanagi Plant IBIDEN CO., LTD. 300 Aoyanagi-cho Ogaki Gifu / JP | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09007868.4 | 16.06.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | JP20080158425 | 17.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008158425 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2135976 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2135976 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C30B11/00, C30B13/14, C30B15/10, C30B35/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
C30B35/002 (EP,US);
C30B15/10 (EP,KR,US);
C30B11/002 (EP,US);
D01F9/12 (KR);
Y10T117/10 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1032 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1052 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tiegelhalterungselement und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2009/52] | English: | Crucible holding member and method for producing the same | [2009/52] | French: | Élément support de creuset et son procédé de fabrication | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 17.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004211354 (GUIRMAN JEAN-MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] * * figures 5,8,9 * * claims 1-4,10 * | by applicant | JPH10152391 | JPH1160373 | JPH10245275 |