EP2264240 - Front loaded laundry treatment machine with steam creation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finke, Michael Buschweg 17 33161 Hövelhof / DE | 02 /
Müther, Robert Mönchstrasse 17a 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 03 /
Kramme, Friedrich-Wilhelm Tünsberg 17 59602 Rüthen / DE | 04 /
Linnemann, Hartmut Nonenstrasse 19 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 05 /
Sieding, Dirk Haydnstrasse 3 44534 Lünen / DE | [2011/15] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Finke, Michael Buschweg 17 33161 Hövelhof / DE | ||
02 /
Müther, Robert Mönchstrasse 17a 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | |||
03 /
Kramme, Friedrich-Wilhelm Tünsberg 17 59602 Rüthen / DE | |||
04 /
Linnemann, Hartmut Nonenstrasse 19 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | |||
05 /
Siedling, Dirk Haydnstrasse 3 44534 Lünen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09008034.2 | 18.06.2009 | [2010/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264240 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2264240 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
D06F39/40 (EP,US);
D06F33/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | Frontbeschickbare Wäschebehandlungsmaschine mit Dampferzeugungseinrichtung | [2010/51] | English: | Front loaded laundry treatment machine with steam creation device | [2010/51] | French: | Machine de traitement du linge à chargement frontal dotée d'un dispositif de production de vapeur | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 14.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HR | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | IE | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | MK | 15.06.2011 | MT | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | LU | 18.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | NO | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
LU | 18.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
LU | 18.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
NO | 15.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1462050 (DIHR SPA [IT]) [A] 7,9 * paragraphs [0020] - [0031] *; | [A]EP1600545 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [DA]EP2006436 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [DA] 1-4 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019]; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1464751 | EP2006436 |