EP2282014 - Ring-shaped flow channel section for a turbo engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahmad, Fathi Moselstrasse 1 41564 Kaarst / DE | [2011/06] | Application number, filing date | 09008227.2 | 23.06.2009 | [2011/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282014 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00, F01D9/04 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
F01D11/008 (EP,US);
F01D9/04 (EP,US);
F05D2240/81 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rinförmiger Strömungskanalabschnitt für eine Turbomaschine | [2011/06] | English: | Ring-shaped flow channel section for a turbo engine | [2011/06] | French: | Section de canal d'écoulement annulaire pour une turbomachine | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/10] | 28.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1557534 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0034] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 6; | [XY]EP1557535 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0037] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 6; | [Y]US2007237630 (SCHIAVO ANTHONY L JR [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0028] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9954597 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 15 - line 19 * * claim 9 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9960253 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5820336 (HASHIMOTO YUKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * line 1 - column 4, line 6 * * figures 5,6 * | by applicant | EP1219787 |