EP2151711 - Liquid crystal sealing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/35] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Hidenori c/o Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Kanda, Hideo c/o Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama / JP | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09008473.2 | 29.06.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | JP20080204334 | 07.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008204334 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2151711 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2151711 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] |
Former [2014/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP2151711 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2014/04] | |||
[2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1339 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G02F1/1339 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flüssigkristalldichtungsvorrichtung | [2010/06] | English: | Liquid crystal sealing apparatus | [2010/06] | French: | Appareil d'étanchéité à cristaux liquides | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 29.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 11.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5793461 (INOU IPPEI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 11, line 29 - line 44; figure 12 *; | [X]US6179679 (VON GUTFELD ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-3* column 3, line 36 - line 62 *; | [X]JP2001272683 (TANAKA SAKAE) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2008070679 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * | Examination | US6636290 | by applicant | JP2004004563 |