EP2269493 - Hub for a mixing tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurterstrasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ring, Martin, Dr. Amselweg 32 61479 Glashütten / DE | 02 /
Preiss, Thomas Schwanenstrasse 5 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2011/01] | Application number, filing date | 09008520.0 | 30.06.2009 | [2011/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269493 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/07 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
A47J43/0711 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nabe für ein Rührwerkzeug | [2011/01] | English: | Hub for a mixing tool | [2011/01] | French: | Moyeu pour un outil de malaxage | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2121684 (KEMPER KATE) [X] 1-3,6,8-11 * figure 3 *; | [X]AU406697B (NEWCASTLE BUTCHERS EQUIPMENT MFG PTY LTD) [X] 1-3,6,9,10 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE3144438 (BRAUN AG [DE]) [A] 4-9 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US2006062079 | EP1982624 | US2193686 | EP0193128 |