EP2219015 - Pulsed radar level detection system using pulse dithering to eliminate inaccuracies caused by tank rattle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magnetrol International Incorporated 5300 Belmont Road Downers Grove IL 60515 / US | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flasza, Michael, D. c/o Magnetrol International, Inc. 5300 Belmont Road Downers Grove IL 60515 / US | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Hussey, Paul Anthony, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09008529.1 | 30.06.2009 | [2010/33] | Priority number, date | US20090378130 | 11.02.2009 Original published format: US 378130 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2219015 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2219015 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/284 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
G01F23/284 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gepulstes Radarstufenerkennungssystem mit Impulsdithering zur Beseitigung von Ungenauigkeiten durch Behälterklappern | [2010/33] | English: | Pulsed radar level detection system using pulse dithering to eliminate inaccuracies caused by tank rattle | [2010/33] | French: | Système de détection du niveau radar à pulsations utilisant un tramage à impulsion pour supprimer les inexactitudes causées par un cliquetis de réservoir | [2010/33] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 21.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 06.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5805110 (MCEWAN THOMAS E [US]) [A] 1-6,8,9,11-15 * column 1, line 25 - line 30 * * column 3, line 39 - line 43 * * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 17 * * column 7, line 11 - line 23; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US6414627 (MCEWAN THOMAS E [US]) [A] 10 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 10; figure 2 *; | [YD]US6462705 (MCEWAN THOMAS E [US]) [YD] 1-15 * column 1, line 6 - line 30 * * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-5 * * column 8, line 22 - line 26; claims 7,9,10,15,16 *; | [YD]US6626038 (CARSELLA BOYCE [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 62 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 67; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]DE102005036844 (GRIESHABER VEGA KG [DE]) [A] 7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0071]; figure 8 *; | [AP]US2009066561 (YOSHIMURA NAOHIDE [JP]) [AP] 1-3* paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036]; figures 3,4 * | Examination | US5438867 | by applicant | US5345471 | US5609059 | US6462705 | US6626038 |