EP2159631 - Liquid crystal display and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | ||
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Do, Hee-Wook 2003-1308 Cheongsol 2-cha Ap. Ssangyong 2-dong Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 02 /
Shin, Ki-Chul 515-1205 Yangjimaeul Hanyang Ap. Sunae-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-ko / KR | 03 /
Kang, Sung-Min 8-106 Sindonga Ap. Seobinggo-dong Yongsan-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Seung-Hee 113-603 Daewoo Prugio Ap. Hwagok 3-dong Gangseo-gu Seoul / KR | 05 /
Kim, Ji-Hoon Hangook Ap. 101-201, Gamjeong-dong Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09008718.0 | 03.07.2009 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | KR20080083301 | 26.08.2008 Original published format: KR 20080083301 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2159631 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2159631 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13363, G02F1/139 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
G02F1/133634 (EP,US);
G02F1/13363 (KR);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/1393 (EP,US);
G02F2413/02 (EP,US);
G02F2413/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2010/09] | English: | Liquid crystal display and method for manufacturing the same | [2010/09] | French: | Affichage à cristaux liquides et procédé de fabrication de ce dernier | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007273816 (KITAGAWA TAKEHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-19,21-36 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0015] - [0017] - [0039] - [0048] - [0059] , [0060] , [0114] - [0116] - [0159] - [0162]; figures 1,2 * [I] 6,20; | [X]WO2006132404 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,9,12-20,30-36 * page 4 - page 8 * * page 48 * * page 112 - page 115; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2006052108 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,13,15 * paragraphs [0066] - [0075] - [0090] - [0102]; figures 4,5; table 2 *; | [E]US2009207355 (YANAI YUJIRO [JP], et al) [E] 1-36 * paragraphs [0074] - [0077] * |