EP2270964 - Method of controlling a power factor correction stage, a power factor correction stage and a controller therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groot, Humphrey de c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House Station Road Redhill, Surrey UK RH1 1DL / GB | 02 /
Halberstadt, Hans c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House Station Road Redhill, Surrey UK RH1 1DL / GB | [2016/36] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
Groot, Humphrey de c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House Station Road Redhill, Surrey UK RH1 1DL / GB | ||
02 /
Halberstadt, Hans c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House Station Road Redhill, Surrey UK RH1 1DL / GB | Representative(s) | Hardingham, Christopher Mark, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Hardingham, Christopher Mark, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | ||
Former [2011/01] | Hardingham, Christopher Mark, et al NXP Semiconductors (UK) Ltd. Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09008736.2 | 03.07.2009 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2270964 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2270964 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/42, H02M3/158 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
H02M1/0085 (EP,US);
H02M1/4225 (EP,US);
H02M3/1584 (EP,US);
H02M1/0032 (EP,US);
H02M1/36 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US);
Y02P80/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2011/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Leistungsfaktorkorrekturstufe, Leistungsfaktorkorrekturstufe und Steuerung dafür | [2011/01] | English: | Method of controlling a power factor correction stage, a power factor correction stage and a controller therefor | [2011/01] | French: | Procédé de commande du circuit de correction du facteur de puissance, circuit de correction du facteur de puissance, et contrôleur associé | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 30.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.07.2009 | AT | 07.09.2016 | BE | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | IT | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 03.07.2009 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.07.2009 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.07.2009 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008316783 (O'LOUGHLIN MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1,6,8 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0009] - [0011]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0026] *; | [X] - JIUN-REN TSAI ET AL, "Interleaving Phase Shifters for Critical-Mode Boost PFC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080501), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0885-8993, pages 1348 - 1357, XP011207868 [X] 1,6,8 * page 1355; figures 21,22 * | [X] - HUBER L ET AL, "Closed-Loop Control Methods for Interleaved DCM/CCM Boundary Boost PFC Converters", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, 2009. APEC 2009. TWENTY-FOURTH ANNUAL IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090215), ISBN 978-1-4244-2811-3, pages 991 - 997, XP031442804 [X] 1,6,8 * page 991 * | [X] - T-F WU ET AL, "Integrated Circuits of a PFC Controller for Interleaved Critical-Mode Boost Converters", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, APEC 2007 - TWENTY SECOND ANNUAL IEEE, IEEE, PI, (20070201), ISBN 978-1-4244-0713-2, pages 1347 - 1350, XP031085385 [X] 1,6,8 * page 1347 - page 1348 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEX.2007.357690 | [A] - SANGSUN KIM ET AL, "Control of multiple single phase PFC modules with a single low-cost DSP", APEC 2003. 18TH. ANNUAL IEEE APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION. MIAMI BEACH, FL, FEB. 9 - 13, 2003; [ANNUAL APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030209), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7768-4, pages 375 - 381, XP010631537 [A] 1-11 * page 378 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2003.1179241 | by applicant | US2008316783 | - "Interleaving Phase Shifters for Critical-Mode Boost PFC", JIUN-REN TSAI ET AL., IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, (20080501), vol. 23, pages 1348 - 1357 | - "Closed-Loop Coitrol Methods for Interleaved DCM/CCM Boundary Boost RFC Converters", HUBER L ET AL., APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, IEEE, (20090215), pages 991 - 997 |