EP2149501 - Packaging machine with 1-point tool locking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Multivac Sepp Haggenmüller GmbH & Co. KG Bahnhofstrasse 4 87787 Wolfertschwenden / DE | [2010/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ickert, Lars Rolandstrasse 78 87437 Kempten / DE | 02 /
Fickler, Bernhard Krokusweg 7 87749 Hawangen / DE | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09008819.6 | 06.07.2009 | [2010/05] | Priority number, date | DE20081035223 | 29.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008035223 | [2010/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2149501 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2149501 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65B59/04, // B65B31/02 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
B65B59/04 (EP);
B65B31/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | Verpackungsmaschine mit 1-Punkt-Werkzeugverriegelung | [2010/05] | English: | Packaging machine with 1-point tool locking | [2010/05] | French: | Machine d'emballage dotée d'un verrouillage d'outil à 1 point | [2010/05] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 13.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.01.2011 | CZ | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | EE | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | HR | 19.01.2011 | HU | 19.01.2011 | IE | 19.01.2011 | LT | 19.01.2011 | LV | 19.01.2011 | MK | 19.01.2011 | MT | 19.01.2011 | PL | 19.01.2011 | RO | 19.01.2011 | SE | 19.01.2011 | SI | 19.01.2011 | SK | 19.01.2011 | SM | 19.01.2011 | TR | 19.01.2011 | BG | 19.04.2011 | NO | 19.04.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | IS | 19.05.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | LU | 06.07.2011 | BE | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
SM | 19.01.2011 | ||
TR | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
LU | 06.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
SM | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
LU | 06.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
SM | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 19.01.2011 | |
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3026295 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * page 8, lines 24-28; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]EP0388335 (STAUBLI SA ETS [FR]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4216207 (MULTIVAC SEPP HAGGENMUELLER KG, 8941 WOLFERTSCHWENDEN, DE) [Y] 2,4-6,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4434746 (BRANDT ANGELIKA [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]DE4436407 (DIXIE UNION VERPACKUNGEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0388335 | DE4216207 | DE4436407 |