EP2143365 - Toilet system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 6Cousins GbR Manderscheider Strasse 33 50937 Köln / DE | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krück, Alice Novalisstrasse 20 54295 Trier / DE | 02 /
Seeliger, Daniela, Dr. Cäsarstrasse 76 50968 Köln / DE | 03 /
Seeliger, Dorian Manderscheider Strasse 33 50937 Köln / DE | 04 /
Tietjen, Claire Friedrich-Kirsten-Strasse 16 22391 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
Weber, Svenja Sierichstrasse 147 22299 Hamburg / DE | 06 /
Krück, Bettina Novalisstrasse 20 54295 Trier / DE | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Götz Breitenburgerstrasse 31 25524 Itzehoe / DE | [2010/02] | Application number, filing date | 09008835.2 | 07.07.2009 | [2010/02] | Priority number, date | DE20081031561 | 07.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008031561 | [2010/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2143365 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47K11/06, A47K11/10 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
A47K11/06 (EP);
A47K11/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Toilettensystem | [2010/02] | English: | Toilet system | [2010/02] | French: | Système de toilettes | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5170516 (DAVISON WILLIAM R [US]) [X] 1-2,5,9-11,13-14 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 33; figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]WO0048456 (ALTICOSALIAN GERALD HAGOP [GB]) [A] 1-2,5,8,10,12,15 * page 5, line 14 - page 13, line 13; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US3771493 (CHANDOR K) [X] 1-2,5-6,9,12-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US3428967 (HUGHES TERENCE O) [X] 1,5,9-10,13 * figures 1,2 *; | [XP]EP2000068 (BEI YU IND CO [TW]) [XP] 1-2,6-7,9,11,13-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE10243942 | DE19843186 | US2007022523 |