EP2161116 - Method and device for machining preforms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems S.A. Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems S.A. Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pesavento, Modesto M. Am neuen Teich 10 a 98574 Schmalkalden / DE | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Widenmayerstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwaltskanzlei Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | Cramphorn, Conrad, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent-und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009014.3 | 10.04.2003 | [2010/10] | Priority number, date | DE2002115722 | 10.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10215722 | [2010/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161116 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/00, B29C49/06, B29C49/64 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
B29C49/06 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/6427 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/0053 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/7207 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/02 (EP,US);
B29C49/071 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/42392 (EP,KR);
B29C49/42421 (EP,KR);
B29C49/6463 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/6605 (EP,KR);
B29C49/681 (EP,KR);
B29C2045/7214 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2049/023 (EP,KR);
B29C2049/065 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2791/007 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/072 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0721 (EP,KR);
B29C2949/0723 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/0724 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/073 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0732 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/0733 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/0764 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/0773 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/22 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung von Vorformlingen | [2010/10] | English: | Method and device for machining preforms | [2010/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés au traitement de pré-pièces brutes | [2010/10] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2009 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 30.08.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03727196.2 / EP1497094 | EP07014410.0 / EP1867456 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3868206 (ERLANDSON PAUL M, et al) [A] 1-4* column 2, line 26 - line 29; figure 2 *; | [XA]US4005969 (FARRELL JOHN J) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 1 - line 15 * * column 4, line 4 - line 26; figure 2 * [A] 4; | [XA]US4043735 (FARRELL JOHN J) [X] 1,3 * figures 1,7 * [A] 2,4 | by applicant | DE4128438 | WO9739874 |