EP2149934 - Coaxial connector inner contact arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commscope Inc. of North Carolina 1100 CommonScope Place, SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | [2010/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paynter, Jeffrey 229 E. Indiana St. Momence IL 60954 / US | 02 /
Wlos, James 3431 Oakhill Dr. Crete IL 60417 / US | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Geitz Patentanwälte PartG mbB Werthmannstrasse 15 79098 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Werthmannstrasse 15 79098 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/05] | Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Werthmannstrasse 15 79098 Freiberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009427.7 | 21.07.2009 | [2010/05] | Priority number, date | US20080181022 | 28.07.2008 Original published format: US 181022 | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2149934 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2149934 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/05, H01R13/646, H01R24/54 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
H01R9/0521 (EP,US);
H01R24/545 (EP,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/05] | H01R9/05, H01R13/646 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | Innere Kontaktanordnung eines koaxialen Steckers | [2010/05] | English: | Coaxial connector inner contact arrangement | [2010/05] | French: | Agencement de contact interne de connecteur coaxial | [2010/05] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2009 | AT | 20.02.2013 | BE | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | HR | 20.02.2013 | IT | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | MK | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | NL | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | SM | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | NO | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | ES | 31.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | IE | 21.07.2013 | LU | 21.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
NO | 20.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3966292 (SCHULTZ RONALD L) [A] 2,8,11,13 * column 4, lines 6-10; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0431978 (THOMAS & BETTS CORP [US]) [A] 14 * column 4, lines 47-56; figure 2 *; | [A]US5563562 (SZWEC RICHARD J [US]) [A] 3 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6955562 (HENNINGSEN JIMMY CIESLA [DK]) [X] 1,10 * column 9, lines 60,61 - column 10, lines 13-18,43-45,52-58; figure 7 * * column 11, lines 8-11 *; | [A]WO2007089853 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 15* page 9, lines 12-16 *; | [A]EP1860744 (MICRO COAX INC [US]) [A] 4-7 * paragraphs [0024] , [0037]; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | US7335059 |