EP2277497 - Composition and method for colouring hair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Strasse 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uellner, Martin Kavalleriesand 37b 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Pratt, Dominik Mainzer Strasse 4 64572 Büttelborn / DE | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Grit, Mustafa, et al KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2011/04] | Application number, filing date | 09009458.2 | 22.07.2009 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2277497 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/04, A61Q5/10, A61K8/36 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/046 (EP,US);
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/24 (EP,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Färbung von Haar | [2011/04] | English: | Composition and method for colouring hair | [2011/04] | French: | Composition et procédé de coloration des cheveux | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 05.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1470812 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0047] , [0048] * * examples 2-4 *; | [XY]US5814106 (AUDOUSSET MARIE-PASCALE [FR]) [X] 14 * column 1, line 44 - line 64 * * column 6, line 18 - line 23 * * column 6, line 37 - line 48 * * examples 1,2 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US5431698 (TENNIGKEIT JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 14 * column 1, line 21 - line 35 * * column 1, line 41 - line 59 * * column 2, line 28 - line 44 * * examples 1-4 * [Y] 1-15; | JPS62185008 [ ] (NIKKA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [XY]US5683474 (COTTERET JEAN [FR], et al) [X] 14 * examples 1-8 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO2009047022 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [Y] 2 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 4, paragraphs 2,4 * * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 4 * * examples 2.2,2.3 *; | [Y]EP0744175 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [Y] 2 * page 3, line 13 - line 23 * * page 4, line 19 - line 32 *; | [Y]EP0925775 (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] * | [XY] - NANHO, YUKIO ET AL., "Preparation of acidic permanent oxidative hair dyes", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870813), vol. 54, no. 2, Database accession no. 107:223046, XP002564217 [X] 14 * column A * [Y] 1-15 | [Y] - HORINSHI N ET AL, "Cosmetic material for hair which prevents damage - contains quat. ammonium or amine salt and fatty acid", DATABASE WPI, (19931102), vol. 1993, no. 48, XP002558267 [Y] 2 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0524612 | EP0640643 | WO9515144 | WO2005065632 | - Hagers Handbuch der pharmazeutischen Praxis |