EP2157428 - Biosensor container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2016/34] |
Former [2010/08] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68308 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Surridge, Nigel 857 Nevelle Lane Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 02 /
Joseph, Abner 3691 Gould Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 03 /
Chan, Frank 1514 Harrison Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
Gerber, Martin 12546 Glendurgan Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 05 /
Sauers, Matt 5068 Clemens Place Indianapolis, IN 46239 / US | [2014/19] |
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
Surridge, Nigel 857 Nevelle Lane Carmel IN 46032 / US | ||
02 /
Joseph, Abner 3691 Gould Drive Carmel IN 46033 / US | |||
03 /
Chan, Frank 1514 Harrison Court Sunnyvale CA 94087 / US | |||
04 /
Gerber, Martin 12546 Glendurgan Drive Carmel IN 46032 / US | |||
05 /
Sauers, Matt 5068 Clemens Place Indianapolis IN 46239 / US | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Stößel, Matthias Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009546.4 | 23.07.2009 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | US20080181519 | 29.07.2008 Original published format: US 181519 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2157428 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2157428 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, G01N27/327 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
G01N33/48771 (EP,US);
G01N27/3273 (EP,US);
G01N33/48757 (EP,US);
G01N33/48778 (EP,US);
Y10T436/104998 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/08] | G01N33/487 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Biosensorbehälter | [2010/08] | English: | Biosensor container | [2010/08] | French: | Conteneur de biocapteur | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 24.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 28.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03082091 (INVERNESS MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 10, line 30 - page 21, line 11; figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP1352611 (INVERNESS MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [X] 9* paragraphs [0057] - [0065] - [0072] , [0076] - [0081]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2006189895 (NEEL GARY T [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,10 * paragraph [0144]; figure 23 *; | [X]WO2007072009 (LIFESCAN SCOTLAND LTD [GB], et al) [X] 9 * paragraphs [0075] - [0077]; figure 22 *; | [X]WO2007112961 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 3-5,7,9 * page 21, line 24 - page 24, line 27; figures 16-18 *; | [I]US2007293790 (BAINCZYK GREGOR [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0049] - [0067]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]WO2008021179 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * paragraphs [0032] - [0037] - [0051] - [0054]; figure 1.5 * |