EP2154339 - Oil sump with oil filter on carrier unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBS Filtran Kunststoff-/Metallerzeugnisse GmbH Industriestrasse 19 51597 Morsbach / DE | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beer, Markus Obere Kirchstrasse 11 51597 Morsbach / DE | 02 /
Sahm, Dietmar Wacholderweg 16 51580 Reichshof / DE | 03 /
Stausberg, Wolfgang Heide 30 51597 Morsbach / DE | 04 /
Piehlk, Andreas Am Mühlenberg 8 57258 Freudenberg / DE | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 100411 51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Kierdorf Ritschel Sattlerweg 14 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Polypatent Postfach 10 04 11 51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2010/17] | Godemeyer, Thomas Fleischer, Godemeyer, Kierdorf & Partner, Patentanwälte Polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2010/16] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2010/07] | Lang, Friedrich, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009565.4 | 23.07.2009 | [2010/07] | Priority number, date | DE20081038958 | 13.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008038958 | [2010/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154339 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/00, F16H57/04 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
F01M11/0004 (EP,US);
F01M11/03 (KR);
F01M1/10 (KR);
F01M11/04 (KR);
F01M2011/0029 (EP,US);
F16H57/0404 (EP,US);
F16H57/0452 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ölwanne mit Öfilter an Trägereinheit | [2010/07] | English: | Oil sump with oil filter on carrier unit | [2010/07] | French: | Carter doté d'un filtre à huile sur une unité de support | [2010/07] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 23.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1253299 (JOMA POLYTEC KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19735445 (IBS FILTRAN KUNSTSTOFF METALL [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0924396 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4242513 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0811761 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1339954 | EP1333160 | DE102005025726 | DE10008692 | DE19735445 |