EP2282077 - Dampening device and accompanying rotating elastic coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckel, Hans-Gerd Wagnerstr. 11 69514 Laudenbach / DE | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/42] | Application number, filing date | 09010046.2 | 04.08.2009 | [2011/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282077 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282077 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/52, F16F15/16 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
F16F9/523 (EP);
F16F15/161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | Dämpfungsvorrichtung und drehelastische Kupplung damit | [2011/06] | English: | Dampening device and accompanying rotating elastic coupling | [2011/06] | French: | Dispositif d'amortissement et embrayage élastique rotatif en étant équipé | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2010 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 27.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2009 | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | DK | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | FI | 17.10.2012 | HR | 17.10.2012 | IT | 17.10.2012 | LT | 17.10.2012 | LV | 17.10.2012 | MC | 17.10.2012 | MK | 17.10.2012 | MT | 17.10.2012 | NL | 17.10.2012 | PL | 17.10.2012 | RO | 17.10.2012 | SE | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | SM | 17.10.2012 | TR | 17.10.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | NO | 17.01.2013 | GR | 18.01.2013 | ES | 28.01.2013 | IS | 17.02.2013 | PT | 18.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
MK | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
SM | 17.10.2012 | ||
TR | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
SM | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 17.10.2012 | |
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 17.10.2012 | |
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 17.10.2012 | |
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 17.10.2012 | |
NO | 17.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3227903 (F & O ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS [DE]) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [A] 2-9,11; | [A]DE10307362 (ZF SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]FR2339104 (GEISLINGER DR ING LEONARD [AT]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5191811 (KOGURE TOSHIHARU [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]DE10057822 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3227903 |