EP2199932 - SELECTABLE DATA MIGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/25] | Selectable data migration | ||
[2022/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP SE Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2014/43] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Driesen, Volker c/o SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | 02 /
Specht, Jürgen c/o SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2022/18] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
Driesen, Volker c/o SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | ||
02 /
Specht, Jürgen c/o SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/18] |
Former [2014/11] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Rocke, Carsten Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010176.7 | 06.08.2009 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | US20080336897 | 17.12.2008 Original published format: US 336897 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199932 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199932 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/21 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
G06F16/214 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄHLBARE DATENMIGRATION | [2022/08] | English: | SELECTABLE DATA MIGRATION | [2022/08] | French: | MIGRATION DE DONNÉES SÉLECTIONNABLES | [2022/08] |
Former [2010/25] | Wählbare Datenmigration | ||
Former [2010/25] | Selectable data migration | ||
Former [2010/25] | Migration de données sélectionnables | Examination procedure | 09.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2009 | AT | 04.05.2022 | CY | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | ES | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | IT | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | MK | 04.05.2022 | MT | 04.05.2022 | NL | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | TR | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IE | 06.08.2022 | LU | 06.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.08.2009 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
MK | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
TR | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 06.08.2009 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
MK | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.08.2009 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.08.2009 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - RAJIV GANDHI ET AL, "Combinatorial Algorithms for Data Migration to Minimize Average Completion Time", ALGORITHMICA, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20071114), vol. 54, no. 1, ISSN 1432-0541, pages 54 - 71, XP019717001 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 55, line 1 - page 61, line 31; figures 1-3 * | [A] - CONNELLY T ET AL, "Solving the NGN Data Migration Challenge", ANNUAL REVIEW OF COMMUNICATIONS, NATIONAL ENGINEERING CONSORTIUM, CHICAGO, IL, US, (20080101), vol. 61, ISSN 0886-229X, pages 115 - 121, XP001522955 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - HOHENSTEIN U, "Supporting data migration between relational and object-oriented databases using a federation approach", DATABASE ENGINEERING AND APPLICATIONS SYMPOSIUM, 2000 INTERNATIONAL SEPT. 18-20, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000918), ISBN 978-0-7695-0789-7, pages 371 - 379, XP010519045 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | - Matthew Huras ET AL, " IBM DB2 for Linux , UNIX , and Windows Best Practices Minimizing Planned Outages Minimizing Planned Outages Executive", (20080831), URL: https://www.ibm.com/developerworks/community/wikis/form/anonymous/api/wiki/0fc2f498-7b3e-4285-8881-2b6c0490ceb9/page/5bc56684-1c82-4e83-beec-ca1347de557e/attachment/33250d41-b145-4f04-bafb-4184cc2debe9/media/DB2BP_Planned_Outages_0508I.pdf, (20190819), XP055613668 | - Robert Levine, "Data Migration Strategies - Wikibon", (20090817), URL: http://wikibon.org/wiki/v/Data_migration_strategies, (20190807), XP055611560 |