EP2164309 - Method and device for operating a hollow cathode arc discharge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fietzke, Fred An der Goldenen Höhe 01728 Hänichen / DE | 02 /
Labitzke, Rainer Altcoschütz 8a 01189 Dresden / DE | 03 /
Krätzschmar, Bernd-Georg Hohe Strasse 56 01187 Dresden / DE | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Ostermann, Dirk Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2015/30] |
Former [2010/11] | Ostermann, Dirk Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010366.4 | 12.08.2009 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | DE20081047198 | 15.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008047198 | [2010/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2164309 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2164309 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/46 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
H01J37/32064 (EP);
H01J37/32055 (EP);
H05H1/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] |
Former [2010/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betreiben einer Hohlkathoden-Bogenentladung | [2010/11] | English: | Method and device for operating a hollow cathode arc discharge | [2010/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour commander une décharge à cathode creuse | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 27.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2009 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | HR | 22.07.2015 | IT | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MK | 22.07.2015 | MT | 22.07.2015 | PL | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | SM | 22.07.2015 | TR | 22.07.2015 | IE | 12.08.2015 | LU | 12.08.2015 | FR | 22.09.2015 | GB | 22.10.2015 | NO | 22.10.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | DE | 01.03.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 12.08.2009 | |
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
TR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
FR | 22.09.2015 | ||
GB | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 12.08.2009 | |
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
TR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FR | 22.09.2015 | ||
GB | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FR | 22.09.2015 | ||
GB | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FR | 22.09.2015 | ||
GB | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GB | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 22.07.2015 | |
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3831052 (KNECHTLI R) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 11 - line 26 * * column 7, line 17 - line 45 ** figure 3 *; | [A]US5810982 (SELLERS JEFF C [US]) [A] 1,9,16 * column 9, line 57 - column 10, line 43; figure 12 *; | [A]WO2005083241 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,4,9-11 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 3 * * page 7, line 32 - page 9, line 20 *; | [DY]DE102006027853 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DY] 1-4,6,7,9-11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2008193782 (RAMM JURGEN [CH], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9-11,14,15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0082] * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US4339691 | DD278221 | DE9113374U | US5252954 | DE102004010261 | DE102006027853 |