EP2163496 - Roller conveyor with separate drive component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willi, Marco Trollinger Strasse 23 71726 Benningen am Neckar / DE | 02 /
Porzer, Volker Kuerstrasse 26 73666 Baltmannsweiler / DE | 03 /
Buttau, Hans-Peter Heilbronner Strasse 88/1 74348 Lauffen / DE | 04 /
Ludwig, Peter Alexanderstrasse 5 72072 Tübingen / DE | 05 /
Ulmer, Peter Maiergartenstrasse 31 73660 Urbach / DE | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Maiss, Harald Bosch Rexroth Mechatronics GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 11 64 97419 Schweinfurt / DE | [2012/38] |
Former [2010/11] | Maiss, Harald Bosch Rexrodth Mechatronics GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 11 64 97419 Schweinfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010383.9 | 12.08.2009 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | DE20081046519 | 10.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008046519 | [2010/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2163496 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2163496 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2163496 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65G13/04, B65G13/071, B65G47/26, B65G13/073 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
B65G13/04 (EP,US);
B65G13/073 (EP,US);
B65G47/263 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/11] | B65G13/04, B65G13/071 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | Rollenförderer mit gesonderter Antriebsbaugruppe | [2010/11] | English: | Roller conveyor with separate drive component | [2010/11] | French: | Transporteur à rouleaux avec module d'entraînement séparé | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 07.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2009 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | HR | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | MK | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | SM | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | NO | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | ES | 30.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | |
NO | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6367618 (SZUBA PHILIP S [US]) [A] 1,3,7,13,14 * column 4, line 49 - column 6, line 67; figure - *; | [A]US5011004 (D AMATO MARK [CA]) [A] 2,11 * column 5, line 55 - column 7, line 10; figure - *; | [A]DE1029022 (OFAG OFENBAU AG) [A] 3-7 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 28; figure - *; | [A]DE4238294 (GSA GES FUER SONDERMASCHINEN U [DE]) [A] 1,3,7 * column 1, line 40 - line 43; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP0129911 |