EP2283962 - Laser welding method with reduced helium consumption and laser welding head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/07] | Laser welding with reduced helium consumption | ||
[2013/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rand, Christopher, Dr. Flat 1 Drumgay 26 Cranley Road Guildford, GU1 2JS / GB | 02 /
Fieret, Jim, Dr. Bluebell Cottage The Green Shenington, OX15 6NE / GB | 03 /
Viyyuri, Sreenivas An der Burg 12 85716 Unterschliessheim / DE | [2013/27] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
Rand, Christopher, Dr. Flat 1 Drumgay 26 Cranley Road Guildford, GU1 2JS / GB | ||
02 /
Fieret, Jim, Dr. Bluebell Cottage The Green Shenington, OX15 6NE / GB | |||
03 /
Viyyuri, Sreenivas An der Burg 12 85716 Unterschliessheim / DE | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde AG Legal Services Intellectual Property Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde AG Legal Services Intellectual Property Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | ||
Former [2011/07] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde AG Legal Services Intellectual Property Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010512.3 | 14.08.2009 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2283962 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2283962 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/14 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
B23K26/147 (EP);
B23K26/123 (EP);
B23K26/142 (EP);
B23K26/1462 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | Laserschweissverfahren mit verringertem Heliumverbrauch und Laserschweisskopf | [2013/13] | English: | Laser welding method with reduced helium consumption and laser welding head | [2013/13] | French: | Soudage laser avec consommation réduite d'hélium et tête de soudage au laser | [2013/13] |
Former [2011/07] | Laserschweissverfahren mit verringertem Heliumverbrauch | ||
Former [2011/07] | Laser welding with reduced helium consumption | ||
Former [2011/07] | Soudage laser avec consommation réduite d'hélium | Examination procedure | 01.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2009 | AT | 03.07.2013 | BE | 03.07.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | HR | 03.07.2013 | IT | 03.07.2013 | LT | 03.07.2013 | LV | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | MK | 03.07.2013 | MT | 03.07.2013 | NL | 03.07.2013 | PL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SE | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | SM | 03.07.2013 | TR | 03.07.2013 | IE | 14.08.2013 | LU | 14.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | NO | 03.10.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | ES | 14.10.2013 | IS | 03.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MK | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 03.07.2013 | |
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1153696 (UNIV HOKKAIDO [JP]) [X] 1-2,4,6-7 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0025] * [Y] 3; | [X]JPH0299293 (SHINKO KOGYO KK) [X] 4-5,7 * abstract *; | [XD]WO2008070930 (BOC LTD [AU], et al) [XD] 1,4 * abstract *; | [XDY]DE102004040501 (LINDE AG [DE]) [XD] 8 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] * [Y] 3; | [A]DE3923829 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US3401621 | WO2008070930 | DE102004040501 |