EP2116291 - Air filtration arrangements having fluted media constructions and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street Minneapolis, MN 55440-1299 / US | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gillingham, Gary, R. 17305 Flemming Lane Prior Lake MN 55372 / US | 02 /
Gogins, Mark, A. 806 Millwood Avenue Roseville MN 55113 / US | 03 /
Weik, Thomas, M. 18870 Azure Road Deephaven MN 55391 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 17067 200 10 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Hoffmann, Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/46] | Ramsay, Laura Anne Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09010599.0 | 10.08.2001 | [2009/46] | Priority number, date | US20000230138P | 05.09.2000 Original published format: US 230138 P | US20010871590 | 31.05.2001 Original published format: US 871590 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116291 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/16, B01D46/02, B01D46/24, B01D46/52, D01F6/90, D01F6/92 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
D01F6/92 (EP,US);
B01D46/00 (KR);
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D46/0005 (EP,US);
B01D46/10 (EP,US);
B01D46/525 (EP,US);
B01D46/527 (EP,US);
B01D46/546 (EP,US);
B01D46/58 (EP,US);
D01D5/0038 (EP,US);
D01D5/0084 (EP,US);
D01F6/90 (EP,US);
D04H1/728 (EP,US);
B01D2265/028 (EP,US);
B01D2271/027 (EP,US);
B01D2273/20 (EP,US);
Y10S977/89 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | Luftfiltrierungsanordnungen mit gefalteten Medienkonstruktionen und Verfahren | [2009/46] | English: | Air filtration arrangements having fluted media constructions and methods | [2009/46] | French: | Agencement de filtre à air comportant des constructions et procédés de support cannelé | [2009/46] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2010 | Observations by third parties | 07.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2015 | Observations by third parties | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01963922.8 / EP1317317 | EP07104779.9 / EP1795249 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010963922) is 16.08.2004 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9741345 (DONALDSON CO INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO9740917 (DONALDSON CO INC [US]) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0050149 (DONALDSON CO INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 22; figure 2 * * page 22, line 32 - page 23, line 14 * | Examination | DE29907699U | by applicant | US2887177 | US4020783 | US4082476 | US4162906 | US4650516 | US4720292 | US4900671 | US5082476 | US5104537 | US5112372 | US5153298 | US5189092 | US5238474 | US5331037 | US5364456 | US5423892 | US5613992 | US5672399 | US5820646 | US5853442 | US5954849 | USD416308S | USD425189S | US6083637 | US6103415 | US6110611 | US6117579 | US6190432 | - J.E. WALZ; G.B. TAYLOR, "determination of the molecular weight of nylon", ANAL. CHEM., (1947), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 448 - 450 | - CAIRNS, T.L.; FOSTER, H.D.; LARCHER, A.W.; SCHNEIDER, A.K.; SCHREIBER, R.S., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1949), vol. 71, page 651 | US19990437867 | US20000593257 | other | US5672399 | WO0050149 | EP1317317 |