EP2113461 - System and method for fixing a product in a holder, especially in the manufacturing of cigarette packets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Häfker, Thomas Paschkebergstrasse 24 27299 Langwedel / DE | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Ellberg, Nils Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Ellberg, Nils Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010636.0 | 04.05.2007 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | DE20061021125 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006021125 | [2009/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113461 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/22, B65B35/16 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
B65B19/223 (EP);
B65B35/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, PL [2009/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Fixieren eines Produkts in einer Aufnahme, insbesondere beim Herstellen von Zigarettenpackungen | [2009/45] | English: | System and method for fixing a product in a holder, especially in the manufacturing of cigarette packets | [2009/45] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de fixation d'un produit dans un logement, en particulier lors de la fabrication de paquets de cigaretttes | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 25.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/28] | 11.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07724854.0 / EP2013083 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070724854) is 04.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0689995 (GD SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 3; figures 4,5 * [Y] 2,5,7-9; | [Y]CH491028 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 2,5,7-9 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2310943 (MERIEUX INST [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 2; figures 3-5 * | by applicant | DE2440006 | DE3150447 | DE4037692 |