EP2159824 - Filament lamp and light irradiation heat treatment device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ushiodenki Kabushiki Kaisha 6-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku 100 Tokyo / JP | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizukawa, Yoichi Ushio Inc. 1194, Sazuchi Bessho-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Tanino, Kenji Ushio Inc. 1194, Sazuchi Bessho-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2012/07] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
Mizukawa, Yoichi Ushio Inc. 1194, Sazuchi Bessho-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Tanino, Kenji Ushio Inc. 1194, Sazuchi Bessho-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010678.2 | 19.08.2009 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | JP20080216265 | 26.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008216265 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2159824 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2159824 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2159824 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01K1/40, H01K7/00, H01K9/08, H05B3/00, // H01K1/38 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
H01K1/38 (EP,US);
H01L21/324 (KR);
H01K1/40 (EP,US);
H01K5/02 (KR);
H01K7/00 (EP,US);
H01K9/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/09] | H01K1/40, // H01K1/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | Glühlampe und Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung mittels Lichtbestrahlung | [2010/09] | English: | Filament lamp and light irradiation heat treatment device | [2010/09] | French: | Lampe à incandescence et dispositif de traitement thermique à irradiation lumineuse | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 23.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2009 | AT | 15.02.2012 | BE | 15.02.2012 | CY | 15.02.2012 | CZ | 15.02.2012 | DK | 15.02.2012 | EE | 15.02.2012 | FI | 15.02.2012 | HR | 15.02.2012 | IT | 15.02.2012 | LT | 15.02.2012 | LV | 15.02.2012 | MK | 15.02.2012 | MT | 15.02.2012 | PL | 15.02.2012 | RO | 15.02.2012 | SE | 15.02.2012 | SI | 15.02.2012 | SK | 15.02.2012 | SM | 15.02.2012 | TR | 15.02.2012 | BG | 15.05.2012 | NO | 15.05.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | ES | 26.05.2012 | IS | 15.06.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | IE | 19.08.2012 | LU | 19.08.2012 | FR | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 19.08.2009 | |
AT | 15.02.2012 | ||
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
SM | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.08.2012 | ||
LU | 19.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
SM | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.08.2012 | ||
LU | 19.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 15.02.2012 | |
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3483609 (STONE MELVIN L, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4710676 (MORRIS MERLE E [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0370554 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US3483609 | US4710676 | EP0370554 |