EP2290170 - Profile for producing a ceiling construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich von Lien AG Moordamm 4 27404 Zeven / DE | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klez, Hans-Peter In den Mühlenwiesen 2 56743 Mendig / DE | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Kötter, Ulrich Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Kötter, Ulrich Dörner, Kötter & Kollegen Patentanwälte Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010766.5 | 21.08.2009 | [2011/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290170 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/17, E04D13/147, // E04D3/08 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
E04D13/174 (EP);
E04D2003/0875 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Profil zur Herstellung einer Dachkonstruktion | [2011/09] | English: | Profile for producing a ceiling construction | [2011/09] | French: | Profilé de fabrication d'une structure de toit | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2284836 (ULTRAFRAME PLC [GB]) [X] 1-6,13,14 * figure 1 *; | [XY]GB2236792 (DURABUILD CONSERVATORIES LIMIT [GB]) [X] 1-3,13,14 * figure 1 * * figure 1 * [Y] 7-10; | [X]FR2881775 (RHEINZINK PROFILS DE FRANCE SO [FR]) [X] 1-3,11-14 * figures 5,7 *; | [Y]US6079152 (HOU CHUWG-CHU [TW]) [Y] 7-10 * figures 8-12 *; | [X]DE2846025 (MARLEY TILE AG) [X] 1-3,13,14 * figures 1,2 * |