EP2119637 - Combination of a packaging container for sensitive products and a device for airtight sealing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRSEC 6 rue Louise Michel 94600 Choisy-le-Roi / FR | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lancesseur, Didier 1, rue Rolland Garros 92100 Boulogne / FR | 02 /
Rault, Stéphane 30, rue des Favorites 75015 Paris / FR | 03 /
Brogly, Sébastien 710, route de Géovreissiat 01460 Géovreissiat / FR | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010832.5 | 20.12.2004 | [2009/47] | Priority number, date | FR20030014987 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0314987 | [2009/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119637 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/48, B65D51/30 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
B65D51/30 (EP,US);
B65D41/485 (EP,US);
B65D55/16 (EP,US);
B65D2215/02 (EP,US);
B65D2251/1008 (EP,US);
B65D2251/1016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | Kombination von einem Verpackungsbehälter für empfindliche Produkte und einer Vorrichtung zu dessen dichten Verschließung | [2009/47] | English: | Combination of a packaging container for sensitive products and a device for airtight sealing thereof | [2009/47] | French: | Combinaison d'un conteneur de conditionnement pour des produits sensibles et d'un dispositif pour l'obturation étanche dudit conteneur | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04816440.4 / EP1704099 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4591078 (WEISSMAN NEAL V [US]) [A] 13 * column 3, lines 6-25 * * figures 3,4 *; | [DA]GB2224309 (BXL PLASTICS LTD [GB]) [DA] 14 * page 3, lines 15-30 * * page 5, line 35 - page 8, line 1 ** figures 1-4a *; | [DY]US4934556 (KLEISSENDORF ROLAND [DE]) [DY] 1-15 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 57 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0379775 (OWENS ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC [US]) [A] 5-7 * abstract *; | [A]WO9323305 (WEST CO [US]) [A] 11,12 * abstract *; | [Y]DE9317569U (FRANZ RALF SIEGMAR [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 7 * * page 3, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]FR2705646 (AIRSEC IND SA [FR]) [A] 2,3 * page 3, lines 24-33 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5605240 (GUGLIELMINI BERNARD [FR]) [A] 4,9 * abstract *; | [A]FR2812620 (PLATRE DAVID [FR]) [A] 8 * page 5, lines 5,6 * * figure 1 * |