EP2163664 - Method for depositing si-containing film, insulator film, and semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamada, Yoshitaka c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010938.0 | 26.08.2009 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | JP20080233035 | 11.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008233035 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2163664 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/40 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
C23C16/401 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0262 (KR);
H01L21/31633 (US);
H01L21/02126 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02211 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02216 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02348 (EP,US);
H01L21/3121 (US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abscheiden einer Si-haltigen Schicht, Isolierschicht und Halbleitervorrichtung | [2010/11] | English: | Method for depositing si-containing film, insulator film, and semiconductor device | [2010/11] | French: | Procédé de dépôt de film contenant du si, film isolant, et dispositif semi-conducteur | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 28.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5744196 (LAXMAN RAVI KUMAR [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0005] , [0009] , [0021] , [0029] *; | [X]US2004137758 (LI LIHUA [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 15 - line 30 * * column 8, line 4 - line 11 * * example 1 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 15 *; | [A]US2004216641 (HAMADA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005013936 (BOROVIK ALEXANDER S [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] , [0088] - [0096] *; | [A]US2007026689 (NAKATA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0008] , [0019] , [0021] , [0036] - [0038] * |