EP2146246 - Negative resist composition and patterning process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/35] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeda, Takanobu c/o New Functional Materials Research Centre Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1 Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Osamu c/o New Functional Materials Research Centre Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1 Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Satoshi c/o New Functional Materials Research Centre Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1 Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 04 /
Koitabashi, Ryuji c/o New Functional Materials Research Centre Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1 Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 05 /
Watanabe, Tamotsu c/o New Functional Materials Research Centre Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1 Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | [2013/35] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
Takeda, Takanobu c/o New Functional Materials Research Centre, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 28-1 Nishi Fukushima, Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Watanabe, Osamu c/o New Functional Materials Research Centre, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 28-1 Nishi Fukushima, Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Watanabe, Satoshi c/o New Functional Materials Research Centre, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 28-1 Nishi Fukushima, Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Koitabashi, Ryuji c/o New Functional Materials Research Centre, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 28-1 Nishi Fukushima, Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Watanabe, Tamotsu c/o New Functional Materials Research Centre, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 28-1 Nishi Fukushima, Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2010/03] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09011118.8 | 26.10.2006 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | JP20050333135 | 17.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005333135 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146246 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146246 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/038 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
G03F7/0382 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0045 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/03] | Title | German: | Negativ arbeitende Resist-Zusammensetzung und Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren | [2010/03] | English: | Negative resist composition and patterning process | [2010/03] | French: | Composition pour réserve de type négatif et procédé d'enregistrement d'images | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 31.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06255530.5 / EP1791025 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060255530) is 24.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH1016423 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 10 * page 22, resin BP-6 * * page 26; example 10; table 3 * [A] 1-9; | [XI]JP2001174994 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 10 * page 24, table 1, example 1-16 * * page 28, resin P-16 * [I] 1-9; | [X]EP1285751 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 12 * page 34 ** page 39; example 1; table 4 *; | [XA]JP2003295437 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 10 * page 62, resin GP-5 * * page 67, table 1, example 5 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]JP2004101811 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 10,12 * page 85; example 1; table 1 * * page 86, resin P-1 * [A] 1-9; | [A]US6861198 (TAKEDA TAKANOBU [JP], et al) [A] 11 * claim - * | by applicant | US4491628 | JPS6327829 | JPH0227660B | US5310619 |