EP2161396 - Locking cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABUS August Bremicker Söhne KG Altenhofer Weg 25 58300 Wetter-Volmarstein / DE | [2010/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2015/04] |
Former [2010/10] | 01 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011229.3 | 01.09.2009 | [2010/10] | Priority number, date | DE20081045739 | 04.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008045739 | [2010/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2161396 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2161396 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2161396 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E05B35/10, E05B27/00, E05B19/00, E05B37/00, // E05B65/52, E05B67/36 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
E05B27/00 (EP,US);
E05B19/0017 (EP,US);
E05B27/0057 (EP,US);
E05B35/105 (EP,US);
E05B19/0058 (EP,US);
E05B37/0034 (EP,US);
E05B65/52 (EP,US);
E05B67/36 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7147 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7565 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7605 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7932 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7944 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/10] | E05B35/08, E05B27/00, E05B19/00, // E05B65/52, E05B67/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | Schließzylinder | [2010/10] | English: | Locking cylinder | [2010/10] | French: | Serrure cylindrique | [2010/10] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 31.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2009 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | ES | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | GR | 21.01.2015 | HR | 21.01.2015 | IT | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | NL | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | SM | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | NO | 21.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | AT | 01.09.2015 | IE | 01.09.2015 | LU | 01.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.09.2009 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
GR | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
AT | 01.09.2015 | ||
IE | 01.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.09.2009 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
GR | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
AT | 01.09.2015 | ||
IE | 01.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/17] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
AT | 01.09.2015 | ||
IE | 01.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 21.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE102004011879 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 5; | [XA]AT258756B (SCHOEFFLER EMIL DIPL ING [CH]) [X] 1,7 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 10 * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 9 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 5; | [A]DE3048222 (GOAL KK [JP]) [A] 1,5 * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 20 * * page 13, line 18 - line 27 * * page 14, line 22 - page 15, line 2 * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US3824818 (NEALE C) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 11 - line 67 * * column 6, line 28 - line 47 * * figures 13-23 *; | [A]DE202007009090U (STRATIC LEDERWAREN JACOB BONIF [DE]) [A] 8 * paragraph [0036] * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US6513356 | US6598434 |