EP2161428 - Charge-air cooler, in particular for large engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr Industry GmbH & Co. KG Heilbronner Strasse 380 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruppel, Wolfgang Emil-Schmid-Str. 11/4 75378 Bad Liebenzell / DE | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | BRP Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | BRP Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | Grauel, Andreas Behr GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, G-IP Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011535.3 | 09.09.2009 | [2010/10] | Priority number, date | DE20081046507 | 09.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008046507 | [2010/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161428 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2161428 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02B29/04, F28F9/02 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
F02B29/0475 (EP);
F02B29/0462 (EP);
F28F9/00 (EP);
F28F9/02 (EP);
F02M35/116 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | Ladeluftkühler, insbesondere für Grossmotoren | [2010/10] | English: | Charge-air cooler, in particular for large engines | [2010/10] | French: | Refroidisseur d'air de suralimentation, notamment pour grands moteurs | [2010/10] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 07.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 11.04.2012 | Appeal received No. T1494/12 | 12.06.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.07.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2009 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | HR | 15.01.2014 | IT | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | MK | 15.01.2014 | MT | 15.01.2014 | NL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | SM | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | NO | 15.04.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | AT | 09.09.2014 | IE | 09.09.2014 | LU | 09.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 09.09.2009 | |
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
TR | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.09.2009 | |
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006278377 (MARTINS CARLOS [FR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0016] *; | [X]DE3403001 (LAENGERER & REICH KUEHLER [DE]) [X] 1 * page 13, line 8 - line 16 *; | [X]US2002144806 (GOKAN YOSHITSUGU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] *; | [X]FR2906017 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 8 *; | [X]US2006219394 (MARTIN MICHAEL A [CA], et al) [X] 1 * figure 9 *; | [X]WO2004065874 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3512891 | US2006278377 | DE3403001 |