EP2135863 - Fluorescent pyrazine derivatives and methods of using the same in assessing renal function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mallinckrodt LLC 675 McDonnell Boulevard Hazelwood, MO 63042 / US | [2011/38] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT, INC. 675 McDonnell Boulevard Hazelwood, MO 63042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rajagopalan, Raghavan 13031 Vinson Court Maryland Heights Missouri 63043 / US | 02 /
Dorshow, Richard B. 11977 Neihaus Lane St. Louis Missouri 63146 / US | 03 /
Neumann, William L. 212 W. Monroe St. Louis Missouri 63122 / US | 04 /
Moore, Dennis A. 111 Barto St Louis Missouri 63135 / US | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Thurston, Joanna, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Westwood, Joanna, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 09011710.2 | 22.12.2005 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | US20040638611P | 23.12.2004 Original published format: US 638611 P | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2135863 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/26 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
C07D241/28 (EP,US);
A61K31/4965 (EP,US);
A61K49/0004 (EP,US);
A61K49/0021 (EP,US);
A61K49/0052 (EP,US);
C07D241/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fluoreszierende Pyrazin-Derivate und Verwendungsverfahren dafür bei der Überprüfung der Nierenfunktion | [2009/52] | English: | Fluorescent pyrazine derivatives and methods of using the same in assessing renal function | [2009/52] | French: | Dérivés de pyrazine fluorescents et leurs procédés d'utilisation dans l'évaluation de la fonction rénale | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 12.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05855315.7 / EP1836175 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050855315) is 11.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD] - TAYLOR, AT AL., "Pyrimidopteridines b< Oxidative Self-condensation of Aminopyrimidines", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1955), vol. 77, pages 2243 - 2248, XP002551522 [XD] 1-9 * pages 2244, 2247;; compounds XII, XV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01613a066 | by applicant | US3814757 | US3948895 | US6440389 | - TAYLOR ET AL., JACS, (1955), vol. 77, pages 2243 - 2248 | - KIM ET AL., DYES AND PIGMENTS, (1998), vol. 39, pages 341 - 357 | - KIM ET AL., DYES AND PIGMENTS, (1999), vol. 41, pages 183 - 191 | - NALLY, J.V., "Acute renal failure in hospitalized patients", CLEVELAND CLINIC JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 69, no. 7, pages 569 - 574 | - C.A. RABITO; L.S.T. FANG; A.C. WALTMAN, "Renal function in patients at risk with contrast material-induced acute renal failure: Noninvasive real-time monitoring", RADIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 186, pages 851 - 854 | - N.L. TILNEY; J.M. LAZARUS., "Acute renal failure in surgical patients: Causes, clinical patterns, and care", SURGICAL CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA, (1983), vol. 63, pages 357 - 377 | - B.E. VANZEE; W.E. HOY; J.R. JAENIKE., "Renal injury associated with intravenous pyelography in non-diabetic and diabetic patients", ANNALS OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, (1978), vol. 89, pages 51 - 54 | - S. LUNDQVIST ET AL., "Iohexol clearance for renal function measurement in gynecologic cancer patients", ACTA RADIOLOGICA, (1996), vol. 37, pages 582 - 586 | - P. GUESRY ET AL., "Measurement of glomerular filtration rate by fluorescent excitation of non-radioactive meglumine iothalamate", CLINICAL NEPHROLOGY, (1975), vol. 3, pages 134 - 138 | - C.C. BAKER ET AL., "Epidemiology of Trauma Deaths", AMERICAN JOURNAL OFSURGERY, (1980), pages 144 - 150 | - R.G. LOBENHOFFER ET AL., "Treatment Results of Patients with Multiple Trauma: An Analysis of 3406 Cases Treated Between 1972 and 1991 at a German Level I Trauma Center", JOURNAL OF TRAUMA, (1995), vol. 38, pages 70 - 77 | - "Pathology of Sepsis, Septic Shock, and Multiple Organ Failure", J. COALSON, New Horizons: Multiple Organ Failure, SOCIETY OF CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (1986), pages 27 - 59 | - "Multiple Organ Failure Syndrome", F.B. CERRA, New Horizons: Multiple Organ Failure, SOCIETY OF CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (1989), pages 1 - 24 | - R. MULLER-SUUR; C. MULLER-SUUR, "Glomerular filtration and tubular secretion of MAG3 in rat kidney", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (1989), vol. 30, pages 1986 - 1991 | - P.D. DOLLAN; E.L. ALPEN; G.B. THEIL., "A clinical appraisal of the plasma concentration and endogenous clearance of creatinine", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1962), vol. 32, pages 65 - 79 | - "Renal excretion and tubular transport of organic anions and cations", F. ROCH-RAMEL; K. BESSEGHIR; H. MURER, Handbook ofPhysiology, Section 8, Neurological Physiology, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1992), vol. II, pages 2189 - 2262 | - D.L. NOSCO; J.A. BEATY-NOSCO, "Chemistry of technetium radiopharmaceuticals 1: Chemistry behind the development of technetium-99m compounds to determine kidney function", COORDINATION CHEMISTRY REVIEWS, (1999), vol. 184, pages 91 - 123 | - P.L. CHOYKE; H.A. AUSTIN; J.A. FRANK., "Hydrated clearance of gadolinium-DTPA as a measurement of glomerular filtration rate", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (1992), vol. 41, pages 1595 - 1598 | - N. LEWIS; R. KERR; C. VAN BUREN, "Comparative evaluation ofurographic contrast media, inulin, and 99mTc-DTPA clearance methods for determination of glomerular filtration rate in clinical transplantation", TRANSPLANTATION, (1989), vol. 48, pages 790 - 796 | - "Tubular Function", W.N. TAUXE, Nuclear Medicine in Clinical Urology and Nephrology, APPLETON CENTURY CROFTS, (1985), pages 77 - 105 | - A.R. FRITZBERG ET AL., "Mercaptoacetylglycylglycyglycine", JOURNAL OFNUCLEAR MEDICINE, (1986), vol. 27, pages 111 - 120 | - G. EKANOYAN; N.W. LEVIN, Clinical Practice Guidelines for Chronic Kidney Disease: Evaluation, Classification, and Stratification (K/DOQI), NATIONAL KIDNEY FOUNDATION, (2002), pages 1 - 22 | - OZAKI, H. ET AL., "Sensitization of europium(III) luminescence by DTPA derivatives", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2000), pages 312 - 313 | - "Polyionic fluorescent bioconjugates as composition agents for continuous monitoring of renal function", R. RAJAGOPALAN, R. ET AL., Molecular Imaging: Reporters, Dyes, Markers, and Instrumentation, (2000), page 3924 | - "Noninvasive renal function assessment by fluorescence detection", DORSHOW, R.B. ET AL., Biomedical Optical Spectroscopy and Diagnostics, Trends in Optics and Photonics Series 22, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (1998), pages 54 - 56 | - SHIRAI, K. ET AL., "Synthesis and fluorescent properties of 2,5-diamino-3,6-dicyanopyrazine dyes", DYES AND PIGMENTS, (1998), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 49 - 68 | - KIM, J.H. ET AL., "Self-assembling of aminopyrazine fluorescent dyes and their solid state spectra", DYES AND PIGMENTS, (1998), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 341 - 357 | - Medical Optical Tomography, SPIE, (1993), vol. IS11 | - R.B. DORSHOW ET AL., "Non-Invasive Fluorescence Detection of Hepatic and Renal Function", BULL. AM. PHYS. SOC., (1997), vol. 42, page 681 | - "Monitoring Physiological Function by Detection of Exogenous Fluorescent Contrast Agents", R.B. DORSHOW ET AL., Optical Diagnostics of Biological Fluids IV, (1999), vol. 3599, pages 2 - 8 |