EP2157097 - Specific binding agents of human angiopoietin-2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen, Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Min, Hosung 3875 Conner Court Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US | 02 /
Oliner, Jonathan Daniel 959 Golden Crest Avenue Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Care, Alison, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Care, Alison, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09011712.8 | 11.10.2002 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | US20010328624P | 11.10.2001 Original published format: US 328624 P | US20020414155P | 27.09.2002 Original published format: US 414155 P | US20020269695 | 10.10.2002 Original published format: US 269695 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157097 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/00, C07K1/00, C07K14/00 | [2010/08] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2010/08] | Extension states | AL | 20.08.2010 | LT | 20.08.2010 | LV | 20.08.2010 | MK | 20.08.2010 | RO | 20.08.2010 | SI | 20.08.2010 | Title | German: | Spezifische Bindungsmittel des menschlichen Angiopoietin-2 | [2010/08] | English: | Specific binding agents of human angiopoietin-2 | [2010/08] | French: | Agent de liaison spécifique d'angiopoiétine 2 | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 24.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 09.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02804105.1 / EP1434791 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020804105) is 10.05.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9631598 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * Abstract; p. 7, l. 18-25; p. 29, l. 5-6; Fig. 6. *; | [DA]WO0024782 (AMGEN INC [US]) [DA] 1-15 * Abstract; claims. *; | [A]WO0057901 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * Abstract; p. 1, l. 23-24; p. 8, l. 25-p. 9, l. 15; claim 6. *; | [T] - OLINER JONATHAN ET AL, "Suppression of angiogenesis and tumor growth by selective inhibition of angiopoietin-2", CANCER CELL, (200411), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 1535-6108, pages 507 - 516, XP002348738 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2004.09.030 | by applicant | US3691016 | US3773919 | US3817837 | US3850752 | US3939350 | US3969287 | US3996345 | US4179337 | US4195128 | US4229537 | US4247642 | US4277437 | US4289872 | EP0036676 | US4301144 | US4330440 | EP0058481 | EP0088046 | US4496689 | EP0133988 | EP0143949 | US4640835 | US4670417 | US4710473 | US4791192 | EP0315456 | US5223409 | US5229490 | WO9315722 | WO9321259 | US5338665 | WO9420069 | US5424398 | US5432018 | WO9521258 | US5480981 | WO9605309 | US5498530 | WO9611953 | WO9632478 | WO9640987 | WO9723614 | WO9723183 | US5650490 | WO9734631 | US5733731 | US5739277 | WO9815833 | WO9839027 | US5808029 | US5814464 | US5877289 | US5922545 | US6004555 | EP0988056 | WO0024782 | US6132729 | US6132730 | US6133426 | US6156321 | US6166185 | US6171586 | - FOLKMAN, J., NAT. MED., (1995), vol. 1, pages 27 - 31 | - GALE, N. W.; YANCOPOULOS, G. D., GENES DEV., (1999), vol. 13, pages 1055 - 1066 | - DAVIS, S. ET AL., CELL, (1996), vol. 87, pages 1161 - 1169 | - GROSIOS, K. ET AL., CYTOGENET CELL GENET, (1999), vol. 84, pages 118 - 120 | - HOLASH, J. ET AL., INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 42, pages 1617 - 1625 | - KOBLIZEK, T. 1. ET AL., CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 8, pages 529 - 532 | - LIN, P. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 8829 - 8834 | - MAISONPIERRE, P. C. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 55 - 60 | - PAPAPETROPOULOS, A. ET AL., LAB INVEST, (1999), vol. 79, pages 213 - 223 | - SATO, T. N. ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 375, pages 70 - 74 | - SHYU, K. G. ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1998), vol. 98, pages 2081 - 2087 | - SURI, C. ET AL., CELL, (1996), vol. 87, pages 1171 - 1180 | - SURI, C. ET AL, SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, pages 467 - 471 | - VALENZUELA, D. M. ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 1904 - 1909 | - WITZENBICHLER, B. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, pages 18514 - 18521 | - KIM, I.; J.H. KIM ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, no. 39, pages 4549 - 4552 | - TEICHERT-KULISZEWSKA, K.; P.C. MAISONPIERRE ET AL., CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 659 - 70 | - DUMONT, D. J. ET AL., GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (1994), vol. 8, pages 1897 - 1909 | - HANAHAN, D., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 48 - 50 | - ZAGZAG, D. ET AL., EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, (1999), vol. 159, pages 391 - 400 | - BUNONE, G. ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (1999), vol. 155, pages 1967 - 1976 | - ETOH, T. ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 61, pages 2145 - 2153 | - HANGAI, M. ET AL., INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 42, pages 1617 - 1625 | - KURODA, K. ET AL., JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (2001), vol. 116, pages 713 - 720 | - OTANI, A. ET AL., INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 40, pages 1912 - 1920 | - STRATMANN, A. ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (1998), vol. 153, pages 1459 - 1466 | - TANAKA, S. ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (1999), vol. 103, pages 34 - 345 | - YOSHIDA, Y. ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, (1999), vol. 15, pages 1221 - 1225 | - YUAN, K. ET AL., JOURNAL OF PERIODONTAL RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 35, pages 165 - 171 | - MEZQUITA, J. ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1999), vol. 260, pages 492 - 498 | - AHMAD ET AL., CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 61, pages 1255 - 1259 | - YU ET AL., AM. J. PATH., (2001), vol. 158, pages 563 - 570 | - LIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 8829 - 8834 | - LIN ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1997), vol. 100, pages 2072 - 2078 | - SIEMEISTER ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, pages 3185 - 3189 | - ZHENG ET AL., J. BNMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, pages 5590 - 5600 | - FISHER ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1996), vol. 334, pages 1697 - 1702 | - VAN ZEE, K. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 156, pages 2221 - 2230 | - CAPON ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 337, pages 525 - 531 | - HARVILL ET AL., LMMUNOTECH., (1995), vol. 1, pages 95 - 105 | - LINSLEY, J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 174, pages 561 - 569 | - ELLISON ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS. RES., (1982), vol. 10, pages 4071 - 9 | - CLACKSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, pages 383 - 6 | - SCOTT ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, page 386 | - DEVLIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, page 404 | - CWIRLA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 276, pages 1696 - 9 | - LOWMAN, ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOMOL. STRUCT., (1997), vol. 26, pages 401 - 24 | - TAKASAKI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH, (1997), vol. 15, pages 1266 - 70 | - ROBERTS; SZOSTAK, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 12297 - 303 | - WELLS; LOWMAN, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECLUZOL., (1992), vol. 3, pages 355 - 62 | - CORTESE ET AL., CURR. OPIN BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 7, pages 616 - 21 | - KREEGER, THE SCIENTIST, (1996), vol. 10, no. 13, pages 19 - 20 | - DEDMAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 23025 - 30 | - BHATNAGAR ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 3814 - 9 | - CUTHBERTSON ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1997), vol. 40, pages 2876 - 82 | - MOLEC. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 633 - 9 | - CARILLO ET AL., SIAM J. APPLIED MATH., (1988), vol. 48, page 1073 | - DEVEREUX ET AL., NUCL. ACID. RES., (1984), vol. 12, page 387 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - DAYHOFF ET AL., ATLAS OF PROTEIN SEQUENCE AND STRUCTURE, (1978), vol. 5, no. 3 | - HENIKOFF ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - NEEDLEMAN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - LEWIN, B., Genes V, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1994), page 11 | - KYTE ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 157, pages 105 - 131 | - MOULT J., CURR. OP. IN BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 422 - 427 | - CHOU ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 222 - 245 | - CHOU ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 113, no. 2, pages 211 - 222 | - CHOU ET AL., ADV. ENZYMOL. RELAT. AREAS MOL. BIOL., (1978), vol. 47, pages 45 - 148 | - CHOU ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., vol. 47, pages 251 - 276 | - CHOU ET AL., BIOPHYS. J., (1979), vol. 26, pages 367 - 384 | - HOLM ET AL., NUCL. ACID. RES., (1999), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 244 - 247 | - BRENNER ET AL., CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1997), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 369 - 376 | - JONES, D., CUN". OPIN. STRUCT. BIOL., (1997), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 377 - 87 | - SIPPL ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1996), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 15 - 19 | - BOWIE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 253, pages 164 - 170 | - GRIBSKOV ET AL., METH. ENZYM., (1990), vol. 183, pages 146 - 159 | - GRIBSKOV ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, no. 13, pages 4355 - 4358 | - CREIGHTON, T.E., Proteins: Structure and Molecule Properties, W. H. FREEMAN & CO., (1983), pages 79 - 86 | - JONES, D., CURR. OPIN. STRUCT. BIOL., (1997), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 377 - 87 | - SIPPL ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1996), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 15 - 9 | - GRIBSKOV ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, no. 13, pages 4355 - 8 | - CREIGHTON, Proteins: Structure and Molecule Properties, W. H. FREEMAN & CO., (1983), pages 79 - 86 | - NACHMAN ET AL., REGUL. PEPT., (1995), vol. 57, pages 359 - 370 | - TAM ET AL., J. AIN. CHEM. SOC., (1983), vol. 105, page 6442 | - MERRIFIELD, SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 232, pages 341 - 347 | - BARANY; MERRIFIELD, The Peptides., ACADEMIC PRESS, pages 1 - 284 | - BARANY ET AL., HIT. J. PEP. PROTEIN RES., (1987), vol. 30, pages 705 - 739 | - SMITH ET AL., J. VIROL., (1983), vol. 46, page 584 | - ENGELHARD ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. (USA), (1994), vol. 91, pages 3224 - 7 | - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 43 | - CAPALDI ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1977), vol. 76, page 425 | - "Methods in Cell Biology", Antibodies in Cell Biology., ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1993), vol. 37 | - AKERSTROM, J. IMMUNOL., (1985), vol. 135, pages 2589 - 2542 | - CHAUBERT, MOD. PATHOL., (1997), vol. 10, pages 585 - 591 | - HARLOW; LANE, Antibodies, A Laboratory Manual, pages 579 - 583 | - MADDOX ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1983), vol. 158, page 1211 | - BAYER ET AL., METH. ENZ., (1990), vol. 184, pages 138 - 163 | - OGOSHI ET AL., J. INV. DENNATOL., (1998), vol. 110, pages 818 - 23 | - SIDMAN ET AL., BIOPOLYINERS, (1983), vol. 22, pages 547 - 556 | - LANGER ET AL., CHEM. TECH., (1982), vol. 12, pages 98 - 105 | - EPPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA), (1985), vol. 82, pages 3688 - 3692 | - TARTOF; HOBBS, "Improved media for growing plasmid and cosmid clones", BETHESDA RESEARCH LABS FOCUS, (1987), vol. 9, page 12 | - FEIGE ET AL., CELLULAR MOLEC. LIFE SCI., (2000), vol. 57, pages 1457 - 1470 | US20010328624 |