EP2295375 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING WASTE SULPHURIC ACIDS FROM NITRATION PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/11] | Method and device for processing waste sulphuric acids from nitration processes | ||
[2015/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Dietrich Process Systems GmbH Hattenbergstrasse 36 55122 Mainz / DE | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dichtl, Gottfried Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 40 55270 Zornheim / DE | 02 /
Steeg, Harald Gutenfelsstrasse 5 55422 Bacharach / DE | [2012/50] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
Dichtl, Gottfried Fuststrasse 25 55268 Nieder-Olm / DE | ||
02 /
Steeg, Harald Gutenfelsstrasse 5 55422 Bacharach / DE | Representative(s) | Friese Goeden Patentanwälte PartGmbB Widenmayerstraße 49 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Uhlandstraße 2 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/24] | Andrae Westendorp Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/11] | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011773.0 | 15.09.2009 | [2011/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2295375 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2295375 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/94, C01B21/46 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
C01B21/46 (EP,US);
B01D3/143 (US);
B01D3/148 (US);
C01B17/94 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2011/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR AUFARBEITUNG VON ABFALL-SCHWEFELSÄUREN AUS NITRIERPROZESSEN | [2015/50] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING WASTE SULPHURIC ACIDS FROM NITRATION PROCESSES | [2015/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE DÉCHETS D'ACIDES SULFURIQUES ISSUS DE PROCESSUS DE NITRATION | [2015/50] |
Former [2011/11] | Verfahren und Anlage zur Aufarbeitung von Abfall-Schwefelsäuren aus Nitrierprozessen | ||
Former [2011/11] | Method and device for processing waste sulphuric acids from nitration processes | ||
Former [2011/11] | Procédé et installation pour le traitement de déchets d'acides sulfuriques issus de processus de nitration | Examination procedure | 16.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | MT | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | SM | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | LU | 15.09.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | CY | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | CY | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]EP1876142 (QVF ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]) [ID] 15-18 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-14; | [IDA]DE102006013579 (PLINKE GMBH [DE]) [ID] 15-18 * figure 2 * [A] 1-14 | by applicant | EP0155586 | DE3409719 | DE19636191 | DE102006013579 | EP1876142 | DE19636191 | EP0155586 |