Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2166390 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2166390



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 189
18.12.2013 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
17.01.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.12.2012 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.12.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
17.12.2012 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
17.12.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
17.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.10.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.10.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.10.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.10.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
16.03.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.03.2012 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.02.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.01.2011 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
18.01.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
04.01.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
04.01.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
04.01.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
03.01.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
03.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
03.01.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
03.01.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
03.01.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
03.01.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.12.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
22.12.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
03.11.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
29.03.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.02.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
01.02.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.02.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 2
01.02.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
23.10.2009 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.10.2009 Priority document Search / examination 7
23.10.2009 Priority document Search / examination 17
22.10.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.09.2009 Annex Search / examination 16
23.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.09.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
22.09.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
22.09.2009 Description Search / examination 10
22.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.09.2009 Drawings Search / examination 2
22.09.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8