EP2166390 - Fibre optic cable, in particular fibre optic rail base cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Kabelwerke AG Otto-Schrimpff-Strasse 2 91154 Roth / DE | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutter, Reinhard Hallstädter Weg 36 90425 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Wolfsberger, Friedrich Eysölden J4 91177 Thalmässing / DE | 03 /
Müller, Bernhard Pfannenstiel 13a 91126 Schwabach / DE | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2013/07] |
Former [2011/07] | FDST Patentanwälte Am Nordostpark 16 90401 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2010/12] | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09012012.2 | 22.09.2009 | [2010/12] | Priority number, date | DE20082012664U | 23.09.2008 Original published format: DE 202008012664 U | DE20081061682 | 11.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008061682 | [2010/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2166390 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2166390 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
G02B6/443 (EP,US);
B60M5/00 (EP);
G02B6/44384 (EP,US);
G02B6/441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | Lichtwellenleiterkabel, insbesondere Lichtwellenleiter-Schienenfusskabel | [2010/12] | English: | Fibre optic cable, in particular fibre optic rail base cable | [2010/12] | French: | Câble à fibres optiques, notamment câble de patin de rail optique | [2010/12] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 03.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 11.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 03.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 03.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 03.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 03.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2009 | CY | 13.02.2013 | CZ | 13.02.2013 | EE | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | HR | 13.02.2013 | IT | 13.02.2013 | LT | 13.02.2013 | LV | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | MK | 13.02.2013 | MT | 13.02.2013 | RO | 13.02.2013 | SI | 13.02.2013 | SK | 13.02.2013 | SM | 13.02.2013 | BG | 13.05.2013 | NO | 13.05.2013 | GR | 14.05.2013 | ES | 24.05.2013 | IS | 13.06.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | IE | 22.09.2013 | LU | 22.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 13.02.2013 | |
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MK | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 13.02.2013 | |
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 13.02.2013 | |
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 13.02.2013 | |
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
NO | 13.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1453402 (PIRELLI GENERAL CABLE WORKS); | [X]US4278835 (JACKSON LYNDEN A); | [X]US5125062 (MARLIER GERY [FR], et al); | [A]US6226430 (DE CASTRO DRAUSIO [BR], et al); | [A]US2002136511 (CECCHI FELICIANO [IT], et al); | [A]EP1378778 (WITZENMANN GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2004105634 (BOSISIO CLAUDIO [IT], et al); | [A]DE202004004817U (TRUMPF LASER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | Examination | EP0432681 |