EP2302566 - Method for connecting at least one wire conductor disposed on a substrate with a chip of a transponder unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/13] | Method for connecting at last one wire conductor disposed on a substrate with a chip of a transponder unit | ||
[2012/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ats Automation Technology Services Unit 6, Block H Toberbride Business Park Collooney Sligo / IE | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hynes, Fergus 4 Hillcrest View Strandhill, Co. Sligo / IE | 02 /
Finlay, Garreth Cashel North, Lavagh Ballymote, Co. Sligo / IE | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Fergus Hynes 4 Hillcrest View Strandhill, Co. Sligo / IE | ||
02 /
Garreth Finlay Cashel North, Lavagh Ballymote, Co. Sligo / IE | Representative(s) | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalt Am Stein 10 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalt Donaustrasse 6 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin, et al Misselhorn Wall Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Oberdorfer, Jürgen, et al nospat Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09012053.6 | 22.09.2009 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2302566 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302566 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, H05K1/18 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP);
G06K19/0775 (EP);
H05K1/184 (EP);
H05K3/328 (EP);
H05K2201/0382 (EP);
H05K2201/0394 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anschließen von mindestens einem Drahtleiter auf einem Substrat mit einem Chip in einer Transpondereinheit | [2011/13] | English: | Method for connecting at least one wire conductor disposed on a substrate with a chip of a transponder unit | [2012/33] | French: | Procédé de connexion d'au moins un conducteur de raccordement disposé sur un substrat avec une puce d'unité de transpondeur | [2011/13] |
Former [2011/13] | Method for connecting at last one wire conductor disposed on a substrate with a chip of a transponder unit | Examination procedure | 11.03.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2009 | AT | 27.03.2013 | BE | 27.03.2013 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | HR | 27.03.2013 | IT | 27.03.2013 | LT | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | MK | 27.03.2013 | MT | 27.03.2013 | NL | 27.03.2013 | PL | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | SM | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | NO | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | ES | 08.07.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | GB | 22.09.2013 | IE | 22.09.2013 | LU | 22.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MK | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
GB | 22.09.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
GB | 22.09.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
GB | 22.09.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
GB | 22.09.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
NO | 27.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008037579 (ADVANCED MICROMECHANIC AND AUT [IE], et al) [X] 1 * page 8, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 19, paragraph 5 - page 22, paragraph 2 * * page 32, paragraph 1 - page 37, paragraph 1 * [I] 4,6,8; | [AD]EP2040201 (AONTEC TEORANTA [IE]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202007013680U (RUHLAMAT AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0045] *; | [A]DE19701163 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 42 * | by applicant | EP0880754 | EP2040201 |